This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 00:00:56 (UTC).

ROSA ONTIVEROS SALAZAR VS ENSIGN WHITTIER WEST LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 ROSA ONTIVEROS SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENSIGN WHITTIER WEST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2774

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ONTIVEROS-SALAZAR ROSA

Defendants and Respondents

ENSIGN WHITTIER WEST LLC

THE ORCHARD POST ACUTE CENTER

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KHAKSHOOY BOB B. ESQ.

KHAKSHOOY BOB BABAK ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MCGILL ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/24/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

5/22/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/22/2019: Answer

SUMMONS

11/8/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY AND ETC

11/8/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY AND ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Answer; Filed by THE ORCHARD POST ACUTE CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by THE ORCHARD POST ACUTE CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ROSA ONTIVEROS-SALAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ROSA ONTIVEROS-SALAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY AND ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ROSA ONTIVEROS-SALAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC682774    Hearing Date: December 31, 2019    Dept: 2

Salazar v. Ensign Whittier West LLC et al.

Good cause having been shown, the Motion to Continue Trial filed by Defendant Orchard Post Acute Center is GRANTED. Although the case was filed on November 11, 2018, Defendant Orchard Post Acute Center was not served until April 22, 2019. Defendant has shown reasonable diligence and the need for further discovery. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: August 4, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Dept. 2.

Trial: August 18, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept. 2.

All discovery and motion cut off dates are to be calculated by reference to the new trial date.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the moving party and there was no opposition to the selected date. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.