Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 04:25:35 (UTC).

ROSA OLIVA VS LOS ANGELES NEWS DISTRIBUTION CENTER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2017 ROSA OLIVA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LOS ANGELES NEWS DISTRIBUTION CENTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6933

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OLIVA ROSA

Defendants and Respondents

SIMON MANUEL

LOS ANGELES NEWS DISTRIBUTION CENTER INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ELIOT SARA ESQ

MARTIROSYAN EDGAR ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GOURDE THOMAS L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/22/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY ; ETC.

3/27/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY ; ETC.

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES NEWS DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC. AND MANUEL SIMON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/25/2017: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES NEWS DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC. AND MANUEL SIMON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Unknown

6/19/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/19/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

6/19/2017: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/23/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

6/23/2017: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/19/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/20/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rosa Oliva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Rosa Oliva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Rosa Oliva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Case Management Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY ; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosa Oliva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosa Oliva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Rosa Oliva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIOT SARA