Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 10:27:33 (UTC).

ROSA MORALES ROMERO, ET AL. VS RYAN EDWARD OTTOSEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 ROSA MORALES ROMERO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RYAN EDWARD OTTOSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1668

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEDINA GERALD ARRIETA

GARCIA JOHNNY RALPH

ROMERO ROSA MORALES

ESPINOZA BRIANNA

ORNELAS MARIA MEDINA

ESPINOZA ROGELIO

Defendants

MARIA A. STARK INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE STARK FAMILY TRUST

OTTOSEN RYAN EDWARD

OTTOSEN & CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MARIA A. STARK

OTTOSEN & CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RILEY GRANT KEVIN

SHAKHNIS PHILIP

MITCHELTREE TARA

Defendant Attorney

CAHIR DEBRA RAE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICAT...)

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICAT...)

Notice of Ruling

12/18/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE FOR ...)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE FOR ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REVISE AND ADVANCE HEARING...)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REVISE AND ADVANCE HEARING...)

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 02/09/2021

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 02/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/14/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE FOR THE HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

12/17/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE FOR THE HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TARA MITCHELTREE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

12/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TARA MITCHELTREE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

12/17/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/9/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

10/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JESSICA

11/2/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JESSICA

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 4:20 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 1:55 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account ((Amended) - as to Jessica Vicente); Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) (AMENDED *as to Jessica Vicente**); Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TARA MITCHELTREE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION); Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jessica); Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Morales Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Vicente (Plaintiff); Johnny Ralph Garcia (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAHIR DEBRA R.