Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 08:50:18 (UTC).

ROSA MARIANA ROCA VS DANNY?S BAKERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 ROSA MARIANA ROCA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DANNY S BAKERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4290

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCA ROSA MARIANA

Defendants

GUATEMALTECA BAKERY AND RESTAURANT A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

DANNY?S BAKERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION

GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC.

GUATEMALTECA BAKERY AND RESTAURANT

DANNY?S BAKERY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HAIGH AUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/13/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/18/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DANNY?S BAKERY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DANNY?S BAKERY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DANNY?S BAKERY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Mariana Roca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAIGH AUSTIN SCOTT