This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 14:28:48 (UTC).

ROSA GUEVARA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS GLEN PARK HEALTHY LIVING, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 ROSA GUEVARA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GLEN PARK HEALTHY LIVING, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8766

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA AN INDIVIDUAL ROSA

Defendants

DOES 1-50

GLEN PARK AT VALLEY VILLAGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GLEN PARK EAST A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

GLEN PARK EAST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GLEN PARK HEALTHY LIVING A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

GLEN PARK IV RETIREMENT A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

GLEN PARK RESIDENCES A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

GLEN PARK VALLEY VILLAGE A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

GLEN-PARK RETIREMENT A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

LAUREL CANYON RETIREMENT COMMUNITY A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

SOUTH EAST EMPLOYEE LEASING SERVICES A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYAB DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROSA GUEVARA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROSA GUEVARA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROSA GUEVARA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLEN PARK AT VALLEY VILLAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYAB DAVID