This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 08:17:35 (UTC).

ROSA GONZALEZ VS PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 ROSA GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8801

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ROSA

Defendants

FASHION NOVA INC.

PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONJNEL INC.

SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC.

ADECCO USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorneys

FRIEDMAN TALYA ZELDA

PETERSON LEAH ELIZABETH

WINFIELD ALECIA WHITAKER

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/02/2020

9/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/02/2020

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS PAGA CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER

9/2/2020: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS PAGA CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/20/2020

7/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

7/16/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA L. ORTIZ IN ADVANCE OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE

7/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA L. ORTIZ IN ADVANCE OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/30/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/5/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 07/03/2019

7/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 07/03/2019

Order - ORDER - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/25/2019: Order - ORDER - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/25/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ROSA GONZALEZ on 08/22/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Rosa Gonzalez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF?S PAGA CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER; Filed by: Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Adecco USA, Inc. (Defendant); Fashion Nova, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF?S PAGA CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Alecia Whitaker Winfield (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Littler Mendelson, P.C. to Littler Mendelson; Middle Name changed from W. to Whitaker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/20/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/13/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Purpose Driven Personjnel, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.62; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Fashion Nova, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.52; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Adecco USa, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 37, col 39] with Document:64308489

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Employment Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less