This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 01:09:15 (UTC).

ROSA GONZALEZ VS PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 ROSA GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8801

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ROSA

Defendants

FASHION NOVA INC.

PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONJNEL INC.

SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC.

ADECCO USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorneys

FRIEDMAN TALYA ZELDA

WINFIELD ALECIA W.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/3/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

7/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Order

4/25/2019: Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/25/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Reply

4/18/2019: Reply

Request for Judicial Notice

4/18/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Reply

4/18/2019: Reply

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/15/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order

4/15/2019: Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/21/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/21/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

3/21/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

3/21/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/21/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/21/2019: Declaration

Motion for Sanctions

3/21/2019: Motion for Sanctions

Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/21/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Docketat 3:58 PM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/03/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Fashion Nova, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Ar...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder (- Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Fashion Nova, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANT FASHION NOVA'S REPLY TO PLAITIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FASHION NOVA, INC.'S, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Fashion Nova, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Fashion Nova, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Adecco USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less