This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2021 at 16:46:03 (UTC).

ROSA FLORES VS CITY OF POMONA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 ROSA FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF POMONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3406

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORES ROSA

Respondents and Defendants

POMONA CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF POMONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

STIEGLER AARON R.

ZUCKERMAN PAUL STUART

BOHLOUL POUYAN

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

ALVAREZ-GLASMAN & COLVIN

NELSON & FULTON LAW OFFICES OF

ALMAZAN ARACELI

GOKOOO ROBERT

NELSON HENRY PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF AARON R. STIEGLER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLA...)

1/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF AARON R. STIEGLER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLA...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/16/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

6/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/23/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/30/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MOTION TO COMPEL

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021

Notice of Settlement

1/5/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/11/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/11/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/4/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

12/5/2019: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/19/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/8/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 4:32 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosa Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosa Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Rosa Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693406    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows. opposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On February 8, 2018, Plaintiff Rosa Flores (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants City of Pomona and County of Los Angeles.  The complaint alleges premises liability and negligence for a trip and fall that occurred on March 24, 2017.

On June 11, 2018, the Court dismissed Defendant County of Los Angeles.

On December 11, 2019, Plaintiffs counsel, Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley, LLP, filed a motion to be relieved as counsel pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 284, subdivision (2).

Trial is set for August 13, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley, LLP asks the Court to relieve it as counsel for Plaintiff due irreconcilable differences that have arisen between Plaintiff and her counsel.

LEGAL STANDARD

California Rule of Court rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff’s counsel completed forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053.  The moving papers were served on Plaintiff and Defendant City of Pomona on December 11, 2019 by U.S. MailPlaintiff’s counsel declares irreconcilable differences in the course of representation have arisen making representation impossible.

The Court finds the motion is properly grantedTrial is more than seven months away.  This is an adequate amount of time for Plaintiff to retain substitute counsel and for that counsel to prepare for trial.  There is no evidence showing Plaintiff would be prejudiced or the orderly process of justice would be disrupted if the motion is granted.

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED.

Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley, LLP is relieved as counsel for Plaintiff effective upon the filing of the proof of service of Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel–Civil form MC–053.

Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley, LLP is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POMONA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF POMONA A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.