Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2021 at 06:19:38 (UTC).

ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CARMEN MARIA GODINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARMEN MARIA GODINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5328

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LEON FUENTES AN INDIVIDUAL ROSA ERIKA

Defendants

CARMEN DENIM INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GODINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL CARMEN MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

FLORES ALDO A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/30/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2023
  • Hearing11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CARMEN MARIA GODINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); CARMEN DENIM INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROSA ERIKA DE LEON FUENTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES ALDO A.