This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:23:26 (UTC).

ROSA AVILA SANDOVAL ET AL VS CHINA IN THE BOX INC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by ROSA AVILA SANDOVAL against CHINA IN THE BOX INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2172

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ACEVDEDO KIMBERLY CHELSEA

SANDOVAL ROSA AVILA

MARTINEZ MARIELLA JASMIN

JOESEPHSON JACK D.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

CHINA IN THE BOX INC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/13/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/6/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

3/28/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

6/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/17/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Minute Order

2/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/9/2018: Minute Order

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AND AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE [PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV. PROC. ? 170.6]

2/5/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AND AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE [PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV. PROC. ? 170.6]

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

2/5/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

2/1/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

2/1/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES ILABOR CODE 201-202,218,218.5, 1194,1194.2] ETC

2/1/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES ILABOR CODE 201-202,218,218.5, 1194,1194.2] ETC

SUMMONS

2/1/2018: SUMMONS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • Declaration (Re Failure to Appear at Order to Show Cause); Filed by Jack D. Joesephson (Plaintiff); Rosa Avila Sandoval (Plaintiff); Kimberly Chelsea Acevedo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment) of 06/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default J...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion for Order (to Vacate Dismissal of the Entire Action Pursuant to C.C.P. 473(b)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Vacate Dismissal of the Entire...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Motion to Vacate (Dismissal of Entire Action pursuant to C.C.P); Filed by Jack D. Joesephson (Plaintiff); Rosa Avila Sandoval (Plaintiff); Kimberly Chelsea Acevedo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jack D. Joesephson (Plaintiff); Rosa Avila Sandoval (Plaintiff); Kimberly Chelsea Acevedo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AND AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE [PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV. PROC. 170.6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jack D. Joesephson (Plaintiff); Rosa Avila Sandoval (Plaintiff); Kimberly Chelsea Acevedo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES ILABOR CODE 201-202,218,218.5, 1194,1194.2] ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jack D. Joesephson (Plaintiff); Rosa Avila Sandoval (Plaintiff); Kimberly Chelsea Acevedo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692172    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ROSA AVILA SANDOVAL, etc., et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

CHINA IN THE BOX, INC., etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC692172

ORDER RE:

DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION

Date: February 4, 2020

Time: 3:00 p.m.

Dept. 56

Plaintiffs’ default judgment application, which was filed on January 21, 2020, is valid in all respects except Plaintiffs did not “apply for all of the relief sought—including attorney fees—when application [was] made for entry of default” when default was requested and entered on April 19, 2018 with respect to Defendant China In The Box, Inc. (Garcia v. Politis (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1474, 1479.)

Plaintiffs’ Default Judgment Application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Dated this 4th day of February 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court