This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 09:01:19 (UTC).

ROOSEVELT HOTEL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS AETNA NA, L.C., A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 ROOSEVELT HOTEL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AETNA NA, L C , A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5057

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ROOSEVELT HOTEL LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AETNA NA L.C. A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AQUATHERM GMBH A GERMAN BUSINESS ORGANIZATION

SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SHAMIM AN INDIVIDUAL MAHMOU

AQUATHERM INC. A UTAH CORPORATION

CITY CONSTRUCTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AQUATHERM L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

AQUA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SHAMIM AN INDIVIDUAL MAHMOUD

SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT INC.

AQUA INC.

AETNA NA LC

AQUATHERM GMBH

AQUATHERM LP

CITY CONSTRUCTORS INC.

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

SHAMIM MAHMOUD

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

AQUATHERM LP

CITY CONSTRUCTORS INC.

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOTTESMAN DONALD

GOTTESMAN DONALD S.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TURIGLIATTO JON

DESIMONE GERRY

DE SIMONE GERRY

THOMAS JACQUELYN REATHA

TURIGLIATTO JON A.

LLAURADO WILFRED A.

DIDSZUN MICHAEL

LUHRING SUSAN E.

DIDSZUN MICHAEL DAVID

HEFFERNAN KEVIN NICHOLAS

COHEN ANNE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE /BY AQUA THERM ...)

8/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE /BY AQUA THERM ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE /BY AQUA THERM ...)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE /BY AQUA THERM ...)

Answer

8/11/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT/ CROSS-DEFENDANT SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT/ CROSS-DEFENDANT SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/22/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

2/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO RTP TO SHAMIM ENG.

1/12/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO RTP TO SHAMIM ENG.

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/14/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

11/17/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

10/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

7/10/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/20/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSING DEFENDANT AQUATHERM, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETC.

3/10/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSING DEFENDANT AQUATHERM, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETC.

Case Management Statement

12/31/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue CMC); Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT AQUATHERM GMBHS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS); Filed by Aetna NA, LC (Defendant); AquaTherm, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Aetna NA, LC (Defendant); AquaTherm, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (/By Aqua Therm LP (Defendant)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice /By Aqua Therm ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (/By Defendant Aquatherm GMBH) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, a Virginia limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Continuance of CMC and Defendants' Response Deadline); Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Aetna NA, L.C., a Utah limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roosevelt Hotel, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHAMIM ENGINEERING CONSULTANT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AQUA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY CONSTRUCTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AQUATHERM INC. A UTAH CORPORATION is a litigant