This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:17:53 (UTC).

ROOKS, MARION R. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 ROOKS, MARION R - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WADA, ROBERT S, JOHNSON, BARBARA R., GREEN, LESLEY C., COWAN, DAVID J. and SUZUKI, PAUL T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3925

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WADA, ROBERT S

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

GREEN, LESLEY C.

COWAN, DAVID J.

SUZUKI, PAUL T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LAMIRAULT INGRID

ROOKS MARILYN

Conservators

PITZER GLORIA SCHARRE - Attorney for Co

DUKE BRITTANY - Attorney for Co

BLACK KATHRYN JANETTE - Attorney for Co

OSHITA ROBBIN K - Co

Not Classified By Court

ROOKS MARION R.

PROBATE INVESTIGATOR

BJORKLUND ROBERT L

SUPERIOR COURT

Interested Party

CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KIMBELL ALPHONSO

BLACK KATHRYN JANETTE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MARTIN FRANCES LOUISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Opening or Changing a Guardianship or Conservatorship ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator/Guardian - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Temporary - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Petition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Petition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Objection - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Objection - Petition - Appoint A Temporary Conservator ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator (Marion R. Rooks ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Proof of Service (DECLARATION RE NOTICE ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Doctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Confidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Notification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Confidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less