Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 16:07:54 (UTC).

ROOBIK NAZARIAN, ET AL VS. WAHRAM AKOP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 ROOBIK NAZARIAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WAHRAM AKOP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7345

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAZARI REW AN INDIVIDUAL

NAZARIAN ROOBIK AN INDIVIDUAL

NAZARIAN ROOBIK

NAZARI REW AN

Defendants

AKOP LINNET AN INDIVIDUAL

AKOP WAHRAM AN INDIVIDUAL

TTG TRUST AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

YAGHOBIMASIHI SEVADA AN INDIVIDUAL

AKOP OJI AN INDIVIDUAL

MINASSIAN ANDRE M. AN INDIVIDUAL

MINASSIAN ANDRE

YAGHOBIMASIHI SEVADA

AKOP WAHRAM

AKOP OJI

AKOP LINNET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHULAK MICHAEL T LAW OFFICES OF

TAMINEH ROSHANIAN

ROSHANIAN TAMINEH

LETTENMAIER ARTHUR JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL L. KRISHEL ESQ.

KRISHEL DANIEL LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - HEARING ON DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC

8/22/2018: Notice of Ruling - HEARING ON DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement of entire case

11/2/2018: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement of entire case

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/5/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/05/2018

11/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/05/2018

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

Order - DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/17/2018: Order - DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Docketat 11:21 AM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/05/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of entire case); Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling HEARING ON DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by WAHRAM, AKOP (Defendant); OJI, AKOP (Defendant); ANDRE MINASSIAN (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by ROOBIK, NAZARIAN (Plaintiff); an NAZARI REW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LETTENMAIER ARTHUR JAMES