This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 09:48:36 (UTC).

RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FCA US LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0781

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREIRA AN INDIVIDUAL RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS

Defendants

SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY D/B/A RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;

FCA US LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SHEPARDSON SCOTT

Other Attorneys

TORKI SARAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC, a limited liability company; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY D/B/A RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM, a California corporation; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RONOLDY OBDULIO VARGAS PEREIRA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY D/B/A RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORKI SARAH