This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:26:15 (UTC).

RONNIE STRINGFELLOW, ET AL. VS MALIC LOVE

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 RONNIE STRINGFELLOW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MALIC LOVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7430

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRINGFELLOW RONNIE

Defendant

LOVE MALIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/13/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/1/2021: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JACQUAN

5/13/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JACQUAN

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JAZELE

5/14/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JAZELE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2024
  • Hearing05/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jazele); Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jacquan); Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ronnie Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jacquan Stringfellow (Plaintiff); Jazele Stringfellow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA