This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 04:32:19 (UTC).

RONNIE JIMENEZ, ET AL. VS JOHNATHAN PEREA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 RONNIE JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHNATHAN PEREA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2657

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JIMENEZ VICKI

JIMENEZ RONNIE

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

PEREA ALEXANDRA

PAUL NIKOLAU AS TRUSTEE OF THE NIKOLAU TRUST

PEREA JOHNATHAN

JIMENEZ RONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOHAN NICHOLAS P.

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

WAINFELD GABRIEL H.

BERNER MICHELLE J.

SCHINDLER ERIC

ASH PAUL V.

PLESSALA BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/27/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Separate Statement

2/11/2021: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/11/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. PLESSALA FILED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBITS

2/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. PLESSALA FILED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBITS

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/16/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 04/15/2021

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 04/15/2021

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (UNCONDITIONAL)

4/15/2021: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (UNCONDITIONAL)

Demand for Jury Trial

8/26/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/26/2020: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/20/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

5/20/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/13/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/13/2020: Cross-Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Johnathan Perea (Cross-Complainant); Paul Nikolau as Trustee of the Nikolau Trust (Cross-Complainant); Alexandra Perea (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Paul Nikolau as Trustee of the Nikolau Trust (Cross-Complainant); Johnathan Perea (Cross-Complainant); Alexandra Perea (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire ...) of 04/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement ((Unconditional)); Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Paul Nikolau as Trustee of the Nikolau Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Paul Nikolau as Trustee of the Nikolau Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ronnie Jimenez (Plaintiff); Vicki Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNER MICHELLE JEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHINDLER ERIC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAINFELD GABRIEL H. ESQ.