This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 09:56:01 (UTC).

RONNIE BASS, SR., ET AL. VS KHALIF KASIM SAMAD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 RONNIE BASS, SR , filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KHALIF KASIM SAMAD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BASS RONNIE SR.

BROWN GERALD

Defendants

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION.

SAMAD KHALIF KASIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEHDIAN MICHAEL VAHE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

1/5/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • Hearing08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ronnie Bass, Sr. (Plaintiff); Gerald Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ronnie Bass, Sr. (Plaintiff); Gerald Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Khalif Kasim Samad (Defendant); PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ronnie Bass, Sr. (Plaintiff); Gerald Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Khalif Kasim Samad (Defendant); PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael Shultz in Department A Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less