This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:24:58 (UTC).

RONNA RIZK VS JAMES ANDERSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 RONNA RIZK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES ANDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3768

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIZK RONNA

Defendants

ANDERSON JAMES

AL ET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

DATTA LAW GROUP APC

HOKANSON CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

GALANG BRITTON P

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE.

8/25/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE.

SUMMONS

8/25/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/9/2019: Minute Order

Demand for Jury Trial

5/7/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/7/2019: Answer

Notice

4/4/2019: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

2/7/2019: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure of Plaintiff to Serve / Prosecute) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference ((If the Defendant(s) is/are successfully served)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by James Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by James Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial setting); Filed by Ronna Rizk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ronna Rizk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ronna Rizk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ronna Rizk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3768    Hearing Date: December 31, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

On August 25, 2017, Plaintiff Ronna Rizk (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant James Anderson (“Defendant”) for negligence arising from a August 26, 2015 motor vehicle accident. On July 19, 2019, Defendant served Form Interrogatories, Set No. One, Special Interrogatories, Set No. One, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set No. One on Plaintiff. Plaintiff did not request an extension. On October 18, 2019, defense counsel sent a letter asking for the responses. Plaintiff did not respond. On November 22, 2019, Defendant then filed these motions to compel.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).)

On December 17, 2019, Plaintiff filed responds to the motions stating she would be serving responses before the hearing. However, there is no evidence responses have been provided. Accordingly, the motions to compel Plaintiff’s responses are GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objection, to Defendant’s Form Interrogatories, Set No. One, Special Interrogatories, Set No. One, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set No. One within ten (10) days of the date of this Order.

Where the court grants a motion to compel responses, sanctions shall be imposed against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) Defendant’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the reduced amount of $930.00, to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALANG BRITTON P. ESQ.