This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 19:25:52 (UTC).

RONI RAZANKOVA, ET AL. VS CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 RONI RAZANKOVA, filed an Other lawsuit against CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0726

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAZANKOV VANCO

RAZANKOVA RONI

Defendants

CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC

KASHANI HOOMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/31/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roni Razankova (Plaintiff); Vanco Razankov (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roni Razankova (Plaintiff); Vanco Razankov (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roni Razankova (Plaintiff); Vanco Razankov (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL