Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 05:31:18 (UTC).

RONEN NOURIAN VS E Z LAUNDRY INC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 RONEN NOURIAN filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against E Z LAUNDRY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1470

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NOURIAN RONEN

Defendant and Respondent

E.Z. LAUNDRY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LOU ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/12/2017: Minute Order

APPL. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT/POSSESSION/SALE OF EXEC. AND ORDER

12/18/2017: APPL. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT/POSSESSION/SALE OF EXEC. AND ORDER

Minute Order

1/2/2018: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

1/2/2018: JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF RULING

11/29/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

PLAINTIFF?S TRIAL BRIEF RE: HABITABILITY IN A COMMERCIAL EVICTION

12/12/2017: PLAINTIFF?S TRIAL BRIEF RE: HABITABILITY IN A COMMERCIAL EVICTION

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT

11/15/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT

Unknown

11/15/2017: Unknown

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

11/22/2017: REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Minute Order

11/22/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

11/6/2017: ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/1/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

10/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

10/27/2017: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • at 3:30 PM in Department 53; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • APPL. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT/POSSESSION/SALE OF EXEC. AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 53; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • PLAINTIFF S TRIAL BRIEF RE: HABITABILITY IN A COMMERCIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Answer; Filed by E.Z. Laundry, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Ronen Nourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less