This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 21:06:25 (UTC).

RONEISHA GANET CARRADINE VS EYAD MAGED RIHANI ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 RONEISHA GANET CARRADINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EYAD MAGED RIHANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6139

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

JACKSON SHAUNTA (DECEASED)

CARRADINE RONEISHA GANET(SUCCESSOR IN

CARRADINE RONEISHA GANET

JACKSON SHAUNTA DECEASED

CARRADINE RONEISHA GANETSUCCESSOR IN

JACKSON SAMUEL Z.

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Appellants

CARRADINE RONEISHA GANET

CARRADINE RONEISHA GANETSUCCESSOR IN

Respondents and Defendants

JACKSON SAMUEL

RIHANI EYAD MAGED

DOES 1-50

RIHANI LUNA

IDRIP VAPE LLC

REIHANI LUMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM

FIRM WILSHIRE LAW

HOLLOMON MICHAEL

SAADIAN BABAK BOBBY

Defendant Attorneys

PASAROW STEPHEN C.

ZUREK RONALD

STACK KEVIN J.

STACK KEVIN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

8/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY TRIAL DURING PENDANCY OF APPEAL PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY TRIAL DURING PENDANCY OF APPEAL PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES) OF 02/01/2021

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES) OF 02/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default - APPELLATE ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM DEFAULT NOA: 09/01/20 B307443

12/14/2020: Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default - APPELLATE ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM DEFAULT NOA: 09/01/20 B307443

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

12/15/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE NOA: 09/01/20 B307443

10/22/2020: Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE NOA: 09/01/20 B307443

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

9/22/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

9/1/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

9/9/2020: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Notice of Ruling

7/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

7/2/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER DEEMING ACTIONS RELATED

6/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER DEEMING ACTIONS RELATED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2020

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2020

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Eyad Maged Rihani (Defendant); Luna Rihani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Stay Trial During Pendancy of Appeal Proceedings; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Eyad Maged Rihani (Defendant); Luna Rihani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONALBE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketAffidavit ; Filed by Roneisha Ganet Carradine (Plaintiff); Carradine, Roneisha Ganet(successor in (Plaintiff); Shaunta (deceased) Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roneisha Ganet Carradine (Plaintiff); Carradine, Roneisha Ganet(successor in (Plaintiff); Shaunta (deceased) Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketAffidavit ; Filed by Roneisha Ganet Carradine (Plaintiff); Carradine, Roneisha Ganet(successor in (Plaintiff); Shaunta (deceased) Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roneisha Ganet Carradine (Plaintiff); Carradine, Roneisha Ganet(successor in (Plaintiff); Shaunta (deceased) Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roneisha Ganet Carradine (Plaintiff); Carradine, Roneisha Ganet(successor in (Plaintiff); Shaunta (deceased) Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where iDrip Vape, LLC. is a litigant