This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 01:20:03 (UTC).

RONALD PERELMAN VS MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 RONALD PERELMAN filed an Other lawsuit against MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1912

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERELMAN RONALD

Defendants

MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION BOARD OF DIRECTORS

ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDS RYAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/8/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/21/2023

3/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/21/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions in the amount of $500.00 against Plaintiff for their Failure to Appear at the CMC of 3/21/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 03/21/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions in the amount of $500.00 against Plaintiff for their Failure to Appear at the CMC of 3/21/23 scheduled for 06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RONALD PERELMAN (Plaintiff); As to: MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A California Corporation (Defendant); ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY, INC., A California Corporation (Defendant); MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION BOARD OF DIRECTORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RONALD PERELMAN (Plaintiff); As to: MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A California Corporation (Defendant); ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY, INC., A California Corporation (Defendant); MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION BOARD OF DIRECTORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RONALD PERELMAN (Plaintiff); As to: MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A California Corporation (Defendant); ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY, INC., A California Corporation (Defendant); MOUNTAIN PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION BOARD OF DIRECTORS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less