This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2020 at 00:46:20 (UTC).

RONALD EDWIN SRENCO VS JEREMY TADAO BRUNNENMEYER ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 RONALD EDWIN SRENCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEREMY TADAO BRUNNENMEYER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8850

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SRENCO RONALD EDWIN

Defendants and Respondents

BRUNNENMEYER JEREMY TADAO

BRUNNENMEYER JODI M.

DOES 1 TO 25

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GOLDSMITH ANTHONY E. ESQ.

Attorney at DERBY, MCGUINNESS AND GOLDSITH, LLP

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

GOLDSMITH ANTHONY EDWARD ESQ.

BARR-FERNANDEZ MARSHA ELENA ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RAFFALOW BRETOI & ADAMS

SIEGEL EZRA D

ZUREK RONALD

SIEGEL EZRA D. ESQ.

WEISS DAVID J. ESQ.

ZUREK RONALD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE NEW TRIAL AND FSC DATES

6/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE NEW TRIAL AND FSC DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE 07/29/220 FINAL...)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE 07/29/220 FINAL...)

Notice of Ruling

1/15/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

12/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MSJ OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

12/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MSJ OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/4/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2019: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - Notice Plaintiffs Notice Of Entry Of Clerks Minute Order Re: Related Cases

11/29/2018: Notice - Notice Plaintiffs Notice Of Entry Of Clerks Minute Order Re: Related Cases

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

8/17/2018: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/2/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • Hearing04/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearing01/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Consolidated Herein Case No. BC705873 - MSJ Granted-Judgment entered) )) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((Consolidated Herein Case No. BC705873 - MSJ Granted-Judgment entered)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Court's Order Re New Trial and FSC Dates); Filed by Jeremy Tadao Brunnenmeyer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date, Filed by Defendants); Filed by Jeremy Tadao Brunnenmeyer (Defendant); Jodi M. Brunnenmeyer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 4:32 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Advancing and Continuing the 07/29/220 Final...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Proposed Judgment (Case No. BC705873 - MSJ Judgment entered)); Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jeremy Tadao Brunnenmeyer (Defendant); Jodi M. Brunnenmeyer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ronald Edwin Srenco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ronald Edwin Srenco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ronald Edwin Srenco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Ronald Edwin Srenco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ronald Edwin Srenco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC688850    Hearing Date: December 27, 2019    Dept: 2

Srenco v. Brunnenmeyer et al.

Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles is GRANTED. Defendant has established that it is entitled to judgment in its favor based on the undisputed material facts asserted. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. § 437c(p)(2).

In the complaint filed in BC705873 (consolidated with BC688850), Plaintiff alleged that he received negligent care and treatment at Harbor UCLA Medical Center, an agent of Defendant County of Los Angeles. Defendant County of Los Angeles has moved for summary judgment, contending that the undisputed evidence establishes that the treatment provided by its agents met the applicable standard of care and that no negligent act or omission by the County or its agents caused or contributed to Plaintiff’s injuries. Plaintiff has filed a notice of opposition to the motion.

To make out a claim for medical negligence, a plaintiff must establish the following elements: “’(1) the duty of the professional to use such skill, prudence, and diligence as other members of his profession commonly possess and exercise; (2) a breach of that duty; (3) a proximate causal connection between the negligent conduct and the resulting injury; and (4) actual loss or damage resulting from the professional's negligence.'” Hanson v. Grode (1999) 76 Cal.App.4th 601, 606–607.

The required standard of care owed by a medical professional is a matter peculiarly within the knowledge of experts. Hanson at 606–607. The element of causation must also be proven with expert testimony. Jones v. Ortho Pharm. Corp. (1985) 163 Cal. App. 3d 396, 402.

Here, the County has presented evidence sufficient to meet its initial burden that the County and its agents met the applicable standard of care. The County presented the declaration of William L. Canton III, M.D. who, after reviewing the relevant medical records and other documents, opined, based on his knowledge, training and experience, that all of the care and treatment provided to Plaintiff at Harbor UCLA Medical Center with respect to the injury at issue here was at all times appropriate and met the standard of care. Dr. Canton thoroughly explained his conclusions by reference to Plaintiff’s medical records.

The burden thus shifted to Plaintiff to present controverting evidence. As noted, Plaintiff has filed a notice of non-opposition.

As there is no expert testimony submitted by Plaintiff to controvert Dr. Canton’s opinion, the County is entitled to summary judgment. The Court thus grants the motion.

The moving party is ordered to give notice.