This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 15:35:02 (UTC).

RONALD EDWARD PRINCE VS ALVARADO RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 RONALD EDWARD PRINCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALVARADO RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0350

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRINCE RONALD EDWARD

Defendants

ALVARADO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

PALO ALTO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS JAKE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RONALD EDWARD PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RONALD EDWARD PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RONALD EDWARD PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALO ALTO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALVARADO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLASS JAKE