This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2023 at 09:05:44 (UTC).

RONALD BROWN VS MODA TRANSPORTATION, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 RONALD BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MODA TRANSPORTATION, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AUDRA MORI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3533

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AUDRA MORI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN RONALD

Defendants

MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC

MODARAEI RON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS JERRIE S

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/7/2021: PI General Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 12/21/2022

12/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 12/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

12/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

12/21/2022: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ronald Brown on 06/23/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/21/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 12/21/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 12/07/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ronald Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ronald Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Moda Transportation, LLC (Defendant); Ron Modaraei (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ronald Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Moda Transportation, LLC (Defendant); Ron Modaraei (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less