This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:16:12 (UTC).

RONALD ALONZO MORALES VS XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by RONALD ALONZO MORALES against XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1977

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORALES RONALD ALONZO

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT INC

VIVEROS ALVARO

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

4/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/30/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Demand for Jury Trial

4/30/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Motion to Compel

5/7/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

5/7/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

5/7/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Ex Parte Application

5/10/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/10/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

ANSWER OF XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. AND ALVARO VIVEROS TO COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: ANSWER OF XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. AND ALVARO VIVEROS TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

2/14/2018: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/29/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/29/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial date and related dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial date and re...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates; Declaration of John Arbucci); Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories Set Two and Form Interrogatories Set One); Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents Set Two); Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant); Alvaro Viveros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • ANSWER OF XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. AND ALVARO VIVEROS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ronald Alonzo Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ronald Alonzo Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Ronald Alonzo Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Ronald Alonzo Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691977    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On January 29, 2018, plaintiff Ronald Alonzo Morales (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. and Alvaro Viveros (collectively, “Defendants”). Defendants move for an order continuing trial from February 11, 2020 to September 7, 2020. Plaintiff did not oppose the motion.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Defendants state that Plaintiff is willing to stipulate to a two-month continuance such that trial is set for April 27, 2020, while Defendants would like a seven-month continuance so that trial is set for September 7, 2020. Defendants argue their request for a seven-month continuance is warranted because: (1) present counsel was substituted into this case on April 8, 2019, (2) Plaintiff’s discovery responses were not served until July 2019, and (3) Plaintiff’s deposition has not been taken yet due to Plaintiff’s counsel’s trial engagements and because of Plaintiff’s failure to timely serve discovery responses. Defense counsel also states that he is occupied with a two-month long trial beginning in May and his daughter’s wedding is in August.

This case appears to be a basic car accident case. By April 2020, the current defense counsel will have been in this case for a year, which is more than enough time to become familiar with the case, and the case will be two years and 3 months old, which is more than sufficient time to prepare this type of case for trial. A trial date in April allows three months to take Plaintiff’s deposition and schedule a mediation. Defense counsel did not give any information about the trial in May, and therefore did not establish that an April 27, 2020 trial date will conflict with the May trial.

Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the motion to continue the trial. Trial is continued to April 27, 2020. The FSC is continued to April 13, 2020. All discovery and motion cut-off dates are to be based on the new trial date. The parties are ordered to immediately informal all witnesses of the new trial date.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.