Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2018 at 06:08:50 (UTC).

RONALD ALCALAY VS 1ST CENTURY BANK ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 RONALD ALCALAY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1ST CENTURY BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3254

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALCALAY RONALD

Defendants and Respondents

FIRST CENTURY BANK

MIDFIRST BANK

DOES 1 TO 50

1ST CENTURY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEICHENGER DAVID B. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MITTSKUS DANIELLE D. ESQ.

MITTSKUS DANIELLE DUBE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/5/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

2/5/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

8/8/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

SUMMONS

8/21/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/21/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by RONALD ALCALAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice (name extension) (of Change of Mailing Address); Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Answer; Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by RONALD ALCALAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CENTURY BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where 1ST CENTURY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITTSKUS DANIELLE