This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2020 at 04:58:15 (UTC).

RONA SUMMER ET AL VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 RONA SUMMER filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, CAROLYN B. KUHL and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5562

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

CAROLYN B. KUHL

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SUMMER RONA

ADAMS AUGUST

ALTURK FERAS

CASWELL EILEEN

BURLA DEEPTHI

ARMANI SABEEN

BHOGAL PRIYA

ATIKYAN ZHIRAYR

CARMI MEIR

ATANYAKUL KITTIMA

BAEK SUN

BAE SHARON

CHANG HAE YOUNG

ALEKSANIAN CLOE

BLOOM TAHEREH

ANDERSON ELIZA

CANNIGAR REZA

Defendants and Respondents

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 100

SEMPRA ENERGY

2,700 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FRANTZ LAW GROUP APLC

GIRARDI THOMAS V. ESQ.

GIRARDI THOMAS VINCENT ESQ.

FRANTZ JAMES PATRICK

FRANTZ JAMES P

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION TO SEA...)

10/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION TO SEA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL...)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRIVILEGE DOCUMENTS; HEARING ON M...)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRIVILEGE DOCUMENTS; HEARING ON M...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER LACC; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER LACC; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION RE PRIVATE PLAINTI...)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION RE PRIVATE PLAINTI...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - COMPLAINT AS TO MIA KIM, TAYLA HAIM, SHUSHANIK HAKOBYAN AND PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON ATTACHMENT 1 (B)(6) OF RONA SUMMER COMPLAINT BC695562

5/3/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - COMPLAINT AS TO MIA KIM, TAYLA HAIM, SHUSHANIK HAKOBYAN AND PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON ATTACHMENT 1 (B)(6) OF RONA SUMMER COMPLAINT BC695562

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Re-Assignment)

1/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Re-Assignment)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

SUMMONS -

2/20/2018: SUMMONS -

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2025
  • Hearing01/02/2025 at 16:30 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Hearing01/06/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Hearing12/18/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Hearing12/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Hearing12/11/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Hearing12/10/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike / Reduce Plaintiffs' Fee Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Class Certification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other re County Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Hearing11/20/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Reassignment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing - Other Re: Re-Assignment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/12/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Saloni Aarna (Plaintiff); Sossi Abanian (Plaintiff); Maria Abdo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

7D 1. .

OINT 71T

Criginal

GIRARDI | KEESE

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

13 Tel: (213) 262-6777

|| Fax: (213) 481-1554

-l}l.aot\)

3 O oo ~ N W

BY FAX

14 Attorneys for Plaintiffs

17 ' | SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

: FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES 19

RONA SUMMER, ET AL, [SEE

20 || ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS FOR en CASE NO. ADDITIONAL NAMES] SEE HT T He 6

N BC695562 22 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

" Plaintiffs, '

23 E JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

24 || vs.

25 1| SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS

COMPANY, a California Corporation; and SEMPRA ENERGY, a California Corporation; DOES 1 through 100, inclusive.

27 . Defendants. 28