This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:13:28 (UTC).

RON LEIBOVICI ET AL VS SARA RABIEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by RON LEIBOVICI against SARA RABIEE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0733

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

REZAZADEH ARIAN

LEIBOVICI RON

Defendants and Respondents

RABIEE SARA

DOES 1 TO 10

RABIEE PARVIZ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/24/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

General Denial

10/4/2018: General Denial

Other -

10/4/2018: Other -

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/4/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice

2/25/2019: Notice

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

3/25/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

3/26/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order

3/26/2019: Minute Order

Separate Statement

5/8/2019: Separate Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/8/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/8/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

5/8/2019: Declaration

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/8/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/8/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration

5/8/2019: Declaration

Notice

6/3/2019: Notice

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA VEHICLE CODE 22350

1/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA VEHICLE CODE 22350

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an order shortening time or in the alternative an order to continue the trial date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For an order shortening time or in the alternative an order to continue the trial date); Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order shortening time ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Elysa Houze-Benson); Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Deposit-Initial Jury Fee; Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Sara Rabiee (Defendant); Parviz Rabiee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ron Leibovici (Plaintiff); Arian Rezazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA VEHICLE CODE 22350

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ron Leibovici (Plaintiff); Arian Rezazadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690733    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RON LEIBOVICI, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SARA RABIEE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC690733

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 14, 2019

On 6/12/19, the Court granted Defendants’ motions to compel further responses to interrogatories and RPDs. The Court ordered Plaintiff to serve supplemental responses within ten days and to pay sanctions. To date, Plaintiff has not complied with the order; at this time, Defendants seek an order imposing terminating sanctions.

Pursuant to Deyo v. Kilbourne (1978) 84 Cal.App.3d 771, 776, the Court should typically impose lesser sanctions prior to awarding terminating sanctions. However, there are circumstances where imposition of terminating sanctions is appropriate without first imposing issue and/or evidentiary sanctions. See Laguna Auto Body v. Farmers Ins. Exch. (1991) 231 Cal.App.3d 481, 490-91.

Terminating sanctions are imposed at this time for three reasons. First, the Court previously imposed monetary sanctions. Second, a brief review of the prior motions reveals that the discovery at issue goes to the “heart” of Plaintiff’s case, and therefore an issue or evidentiary sanction would be tantamount to a terminating sanction. Third, Plaintiff has not opposed this motion and appears to have abandoned the case.

Plaintiff’s case against Moving Defendants is dismissed. Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.