This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 18:12:54 (UTC).

RON A. ROSEN JAFANZA VS CITY OF GLENDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 RON A ROSEN JAFANZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4414

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSEN JAFANZA RON A.

Defendants

MEYER ERIC

CITY OF GLENDALE

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

SPENCER CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN JEROME A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/14/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], PI GENERAL ORDER, STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], PI GENERAL ORDER, STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], PI General Order, Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ron A. Rosen Jafanza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ron A. Rosen Jafanza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ron A. Rosen Jafanza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN JEROME ALAN ESQ.