This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2020 at 10:54:54 (UTC).

ROMIE MADRIGAL VS GEORGE T BORIS M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 ROMIE MADRIGAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEORGE T BORIS M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8433

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MADRIGAL ROMIE

Defendants and Respondents

BORIS COSMETIC PLASTIC SURGERY CENTER

CULVER CITY SURGERY CENTER

KINAL ADAM N. M.D.

WEST LA-VENICE SURGERY CENTER

DOES 1 TO 75

BORIS GEORGE T. M.D.

GEORGE BORIS M.D.

SIAS YVONNE FONTAINE

GEORGE BORIS A MEDICAL CORPORATION M.D.

KINAL - GOOD FAITH ADAM N. M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LUNDY ALBRO L. III ESQ.

PENNELL JONATHAN M.

LUNDY ALBRO LYNN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PETERSON GEORGE ERNEST

LYNCH GREGORY GORDON

WRIGHT DAVID M

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)

8/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)

Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

7/9/2020: Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF MOTION

4/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF MOTION

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

3/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Ruling

3/16/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/16/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Answer

2/25/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE, FSC DATE, AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

8/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE, FSC DATE, AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/21/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

Demand for Jury Trial

10/17/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/18/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

SUMMONS -

3/19/2018: SUMMONS -

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • Hearing03/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Hearing02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Hearing01/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Hearing12/07/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Adam N. M.D. Kinal - GOOD FAITH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (Defendant YVONNE FONTAINE SIAS's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant ADAM N. KINAL, M.D.'s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by Yvonne Fontaine Sias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Court Order Re Motion); Filed by Adam N. M.D. Kinal - GOOD FAITH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Romie Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Romie Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Romie Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Adam N. M.D. Kinal - GOOD FAITH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Adam N. M.D. Kinal - GOOD FAITH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Albro Lynn Lundy, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Romie Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698433    Hearing Date: September 16, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

romie madrigal,

Plaintiff,

v.

george t. boris, m.d. ,et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC698433

Hearing Date: September 16, 2020

[Tentative] order RE:

Motion for determination of good faith SETTLEMENT

Defendant Adam N. Kinal, M.D. (“Defendant”) moves for a determination that the settlement between Defendant and Plaintiff Romie Madrigal (“Plaintiff”) was in good faith. Defendant Yvonne Fontaine Sias filed a notice of non-opposition to the motion. The moving party on an unopposed motion for determination of good faith settlement need only advance a motion setting forth the basic grounds for the determination of good faith and a declaration setting forth a brief background of the case. (City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal.App.3d 1251, 1261.) Defendant has complied with this requirement, and the Court finds that the settlement was made in good-faith. Therefore, the motion is granted. Defendant is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: September 16, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC698433    Hearing Date: August 14, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

romie madrigal,

Plaintiff,

v.

george t. boris, m.d., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC698433

Hearing Date: August 14, 2020

order RE: Motion for determination of good faith SETTLEMENT

Defendant Adam N. Kinal, M.D. (“Defendant”) moves for a determination that the settlement between Defendant and Plaintiff Romie Madrigal (“Plaintiff”) was in good faith. Defendant filed this motion on February 19, 2020. That same date, Defendant served the motion by mail on Defendant Yvonne Fontaine Sias at her home address in Houston, Texas before she filed an answer. However, Defendant filed an answer on February 25, 2020, at which point she was represented by counsel. Therefore, it is unclear whether Defendant’s counsel has received proper notice of this motion.

Based upon the foregoing, the Court continues the hearing to September 16, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders Defendant to serve a copy of the motion upon Defendant’s counsel: Fraser Watson & Croutch, LLP, and file proof of such with the Court. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: August 12, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court