Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:57:05 (UTC).

ROMEX TEXTILES INC VS RUNWAY STORY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 ROMEX TEXTILES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RUNWAY STORY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5682

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ROMEX TEXTILES INC

ROMEX TEXTILES INC .

Defendants and Respondents

SATTO

RUNWAY STORY INC

CHOI MI HIE

PEACH ROAYAL

HONEY DEW ME

CHOI YUN CHOI

DOES 1 TO 50

CLOUD 9

HELLO LOVER

CHOI HYUN HEE

PINK PEONY INC. DBA ABREE

CHOI YUN HO AKA CAROL CHOI

CHOI HYUN HEE DBA ABREE

RUNWAY STORY INC. DBA PEACH ROYAL DBA HONEY DEW ME DBA SATTO DBA HELLO LOVER DBA CLOUD 9 DBA ABREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TABIBI NICO N. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CHANG YOUNG K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

7/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT FOR AND ORDER ADVANCING THE FEBRUARY 19, 2019 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HYUN HEE CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL

8/22/2018: ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT FOR AND ORDER ADVANCING THE FEBRUARY 19, 2019 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HYUN HEE CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE FEBRUARY 19, 2019 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HYUN HEE CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA ABRE

8/22/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE FEBRUARY 19, 2019 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HYUN HEE CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA ABRE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MI HIE CHOI AND COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AT SAID DEPOSITION AND FOR AWARD OF M

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MI HIE CHOI AND COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AT SAID DEPOSITION AND FOR AWARD OF M

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE JANUARY 3, 2019 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MI HIE, AN INDIVIDUAL

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE JANUARY 3, 2019 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MI HIE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS YUN HO CHOI AKA CAROL CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL AND MI HIE CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND NOTICE OF SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAU

9/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS YUN HO CHOI AKA CAROL CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL AND MI HIE CHOI, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND NOTICE OF SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAU

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

2/4/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/26/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/25/2019: Notice

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF NICO N. TABIBI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ETC

3/29/2017: DECLARATION OF NICO N. TABIBI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/12/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; 2. OPEN ACCOUNT; 3. ACCOUNT STATED; ETC.

6/16/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; 2. OPEN ACCOUNT; 3. ACCOUNT STATED; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/12/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; 2. OPEN ACCOUNT; 3. ACCOUNT STATED; 4. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED (QUANTUM VALEBANT); 5. CONVERSION; 6. CLAIM AND DELIVERY; 7. BAD CHECKS C

8/3/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; 2. OPEN ACCOUNT; 3. ACCOUNT STATED; 4. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED (QUANTUM VALEBANT); 5. CONVERSION; 6. CLAIM AND DELIVERY; 7. BAD CHECKS C

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/22/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Romex Textiles, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Status Conference (Regarding Default Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Romex Textiles, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 2:49 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER) of 04/25/2019 and Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Romex Textiles, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Judgment (by Default); Filed by Romex Textiles, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Status Conference (Regarding Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING DEFAULT JUDGMENT)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NICO N. TABIBI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SHAHAB BINAFARD IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Romex Textiles, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Undertaking; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUNWAY STORY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROMEX TEXTILES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG YOUNG K