This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 20:13:45 (UTC).

ROMERO, CASEY J. VS GONZALEZ, ANGELLENA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ROMERO, CASEY J filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GONZALEZ, ANGELLENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, JEANMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6454

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WARREN, JEANMARIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROMERO CASEY J.

Respondent

GONZALEZ ANGELLENA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/15/2020: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

11/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 13, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less