This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 07:40:37 (UTC).

ROMEO KESHISHYAN VS GERHARDT GEAR CO. INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 ROMEO KESHISHYAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GERHARDT GEAR CO INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2007

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KESHISHYAN ROMEO

Defendants

GERHARDT GEAR CO. INC.

GERHARDT CHRISTIAN

GERHARDT KURHT

GERHARDT MITCHELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHAVIMI AIDIN D.

Defendant Attorney

BENAKOTE AMIR DAVID

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/27/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 09/30/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 09/30/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/22/2021

9/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2021

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

11/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gerhardt Gear Co. Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Romeo Keshishyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Gerhardt Gear Co. Inc. (Defendant); Mitchell Gerhardt (Defendant); Kurht Gerhardt (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:48 AM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:41 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 09/30/2021, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Notice - First Amended General Order in Re LASC Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipul...); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 11:57 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 09/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Romeo Keshishyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Romeo Keshishyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Romeo Keshishyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHAVIMI AIDIN D.