This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 12:01:07 (UTC).

ROMEO JUNCAJ VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 ROMEO JUNCAJ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6261

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNCAJ ROMEO

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/16/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • Hearing02/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Romeo Juncaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Romeo Juncaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Statement of Damages); Filed by Romeo Juncaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Romeo Juncaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Romeo Juncaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Romeo Juncaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS