Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 06:55:21 (UTC).

ROMARIC TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 ROMARIC TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SMALL, MICHAEL and ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4548

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SMALL, MICHAEL

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PUNI MARLA

BOYERS ROBERTA

Respondents

IKATU FOUNDATION

GLOBAL ENT OUTREACH

WAGNER YULIA YERESHENKO

WAGNER RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

ROMARIC TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

AIN FARRIS ELIAS

KERENDIAN SHAWN S.

TAYLOR JOSHUA D.

REAGAN CASEY ALAN

MELNICK CLIFF

Respondent Attorney

HUNTER JOHN LOGAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/2/2021: Minute Order

Reply

5/26/2021: Reply

Reply

5/26/2021: Reply

Notice

5/10/2021: Notice

Opposition - to MTS

5/19/2021: Opposition - to MTS

Opposition - to Demurrer

5/19/2021: Opposition - to Demurrer

Minute Order

3/3/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/18/2021: Minute Order

Request - Judicial Notice

1/20/2021: Request - Judicial Notice

Demurrer

1/20/2021: Demurrer

Motion - Strike

1/20/2021: Motion - Strike

Minute Order

11/3/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)

6/16/2020: Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)

Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) - First Amended Petition for An Order Confirming Ownership of Property

9/30/2020: Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) - First Amended Petition for An Order Confirming Ownership of Property

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Hearing07/14/2021 at 3:00 PM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Probate Code 850 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79; Demurrer Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMotion - Strike; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) (First Amended Petition for An Order Confirming Ownership of Property ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketPetition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less