Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 11:18:55 (UTC).

ROMAN TEROGANESYAN VS FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 ROMAN TEROGANESYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4595

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEROGANESYAN ROMAN

Defendants

PASSIONE ROSSA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA FERRARI OF BEVERLY HILLS

FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALOUSTIAN HARRY S

Defendant Attorneys

STUHLBARG RICHARD L

MOHRMAN HANNAH L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL ; CASE MANAGEMENT C...)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL ; CASE MANAGEMENT C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/28/2020

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

6/16/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Declaration re: Due Diligence

6/4/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/4/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

6/4/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/20/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

5/5/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/15/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Removal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Removal ; Case Management C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 08/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); PASSIONE ROSSA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by PASSIONE ROSSA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROMAN TEROGANESYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASSIONE ROSSA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA FERRARI OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases where Ferrari North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOHRMAN HANNAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUHLBARG RICHARD