This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2022 at 16:33:20 (UTC).

ROMAN NAVARRO GONZALEZ VS RODRIGO CORTEZ

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 ROMAN NAVARRO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RODRIGO CORTEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2824

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO GONZALEZ ROMAN

Defendant

CORTEZ RODRIGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIAS JANETH

LEONG ANGELA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/15/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2025
  • Hearing04/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2023
  • Hearing10/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2023
  • Hearing09/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROMAN NAVARRO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROMAN NAVARRO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROMAN NAVARRO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROMAN NAVARRO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS JANETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEONG ANGELA