This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 20:01:12 (UTC).

ROMAN INKS VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 ROMAN INKS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5142

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INKS ROMAN

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

TERRY YORK MOTOR CARS LTD. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALOUSTIAN HARRY S

Defendant Attorney

WOLF MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); TERRY YORK MOTOR CARS, LTD., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROMAN INKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROMAN INKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROMAN INKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROMAN INKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROMAN INKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERRY YORK MOTOR CAR LTD DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLF MATTHEW C.