This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2023 at 00:04:22 (UTC).

ROMAN CABRAL VS W. BROWN & ASSOCIATES ? P & C, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 ROMAN CABRAL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against W BROWN ASSOCIATES P C,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9041

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRAL ROMAN

Defendants

BUENO INSURANCE AGENCY

BUENO MARTIN

W. BROWN & ASSOCIATES ? P & C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SELIK EVAN

ZAOUK CHRISTINE C

Defendant Attorney

DOWNES COLLEEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/21/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/10/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

2/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

3/9/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

Case Management Order

3/9/2022: Case Management Order

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) Notice of Submission of POS

11/19/2021: Notice (name extension) Notice of Submission of POS

Answer

12/22/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

10/22/2021: Summons Summons on Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/20/2024

Hearing02/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2024

Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2023

Hearing12/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Evan Selik (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketAddress for Evan Selik (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Christine C Zaouk (Attorney); Evan Selik (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketAddress for Christine C Zaouk (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketAddress for Evan Selik (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2022

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: ROMAN CABRAL (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
11/02/2021

DocketAddress for Christine C Zaouk (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROMAN CABRAL (Plaintiff); As to: W. BROWN & ASSOCIATES ? P & C (Defendant); BUENO INSURANCE AGENCY (Defendant); MARTIN BUENO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROMAN CABRAL (Plaintiff); As to: W. BROWN & ASSOCIATES ? P & C (Defendant); BUENO INSURANCE AGENCY (Defendant); MARTIN BUENO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROMAN CABRAL (Plaintiff); As to: W. BROWN & ASSOCIATES ? P & C (Defendant); BUENO INSURANCE AGENCY (Defendant); MARTIN BUENO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROMAN CABRAL (Plaintiff); As to: W. BROWN & ASSOCIATES ? P & C (Defendant); BUENO INSURANCE AGENCY (Defendant); MARTIN BUENO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less