This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:16:31 (UTC).

ROLANDO URQUIDEZ VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 ROLANDO URQUIDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URQUIDEZ ROLANDO

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GALPIN MOTORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

MCNULTY ELIZABETH V.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA M. GERAGHTY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/22/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA M. GERAGHTY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/22/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/22/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA M. GERAGHTY IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA M. GERAGHTY IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer

3/3/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC. (Defendant); As to: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA M. GERAGHTY IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant); As to: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA M. GERAGHTY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 01/11/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GALPIN MOTORS, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/12/2023; Service Cost: 88.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant); GALPIN MOTORS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant); GALPIN MOTORS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROLANDO URQUIDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant); GALPIN MOTORS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less