Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 06:11:18 (UTC).

ROLANDO RUIZ VS JV PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & BROKERAGE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 ROLANDO RUIZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JV PROPERTY MANAGEMENT BROKERAGE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9365

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ ROLANDO

Defendants

GOLDEN ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC .A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JV PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & BROKERAGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLUAS ANGEL D

Defendant Attorney

BLACK DOROTHY L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/22/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Hearing04/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JV Property Management & Brokerage, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JV Property Management & Brokerage, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Golden Estate Management, Inc, .a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rolando Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLUAS ANGEL D. ESQ.