Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2020 at 08:27:58 (UTC).

ROLAND S. HINZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT PAUL SCHULTHEIS, ET AL. VS JOHN ODELL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 ROLAND S HINZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT PAUL SCHULTHEIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN ODELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0653

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HINZ ROLAND S. AN INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT PAUL SCHULTHEIS

SCHULTHEIS PAUL

HINZ ROLAND S. AN INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT PAUL SCHULTHEIS AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

ODELL JOHN

JLKRHK INVESTMENTS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ODELL MICHAEL

WARNER PACIFIC PROPERTIES LLC A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ABS CA-O LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

723 EHD LLD A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ODELL AN INDIVIDUAL MICHAEL

ODELL AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NASH PAUL S.

Defendant Attorney

LLEWELLYN GARRETT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

2/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Ruling

11/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

10/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/21/2019: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WARNER PACIFIC PROPERTIES, LLC DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/30/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WARNER PACIFIC PROPERTIES, LLC DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S...)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GARRETT S. LLEWELLYN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S JOHN ODELL AND MICHAEL ODELL'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/28/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GARRETT S. LLEWELLYN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S JOHN ODELL AND MICHAEL ODELL'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER MINUTE ORDER OF 7/15/2019 FOR DEPARTMENT D)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER MINUTE ORDER OF 7/15/2019 FOR DEPARTMENT D)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) OF 07/15/2019

7/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) OF 07/15/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER MINUTE ORDER OF 7/15/2019 FOR DEPARTMENT D) OF 07/15/2019, CORRECTED MINUTE ORDER OF 7/15/2019

7/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER MINUTE ORDER OF 7/15/2019 FOR DEPARTMENT D) OF 07/15/2019, CORRECTED MINUTE ORDER OF 7/15/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/17/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • Hearing11/02/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Hearing10/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Hearing10/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Hearing05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (ReMediation and Discovery) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by John Odell, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roland S. Hinz, an individual, by and through his Attorney-in-Fact PAUL SCHULTHEIS, an individual (Plaintiff); PAUL SCHULTHEIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LLEWELLYN GARRETT SCOTT