This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2020 at 05:06:48 (UTC).

ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC VS IL JAN LE

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IL JAN LE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OKI, DAN THOMAS and GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9940

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OKI, DAN THOMAS

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC

ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LE IN OK

LE IL HAN

CHANG RICHARD

CHANG HELEN

CHANG HELEN DBA MAMA'S CLEANERS DBA SUN VALLEY CLEANERS

LEE IN OK

CHANG RICHARD DBA MAMA'S CLEANERS DBA SUN VALLEY CLEANERS

LEE IL HAN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CHANG RICHARD

CHANG HELEN

SUNSHINE CLEANERS INC

CHANG HELEN DBA MAMA'S CLEANERS DBA SUN VALLEY CLEANERS

CHANG RICHARD DBA MAMA'S CLEANERS DBA SUN VALLEY CLEANERS

SUNSHINE CLEANERS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GLENDORA EAST ONE HOUR CLEANERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STELZER CYNTHINA D.

STELZER CYNTHIA DENISE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAAN KENNETH T. LAW OFFICES OF

PAK J.P. ESQ.

HAAN KENNETH TAEHO

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/14/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING

11/14/2019: Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES

9/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION BY CROSSDEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS, . INC., TO CROSS"'COMPLAINTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS, INC., TO ANSWER TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AN

9/12/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION BY CROSSDEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS, . INC., TO CROSS"'COMPLAINTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS, INC., TO ANSWER TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AN

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL CROSSDEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS

8/20/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL CROSSDEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS

Complaint

1/8/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERV

2/23/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERV

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

3/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

3/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

3/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

Cross-Complaint

4/30/2018: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/30/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL; DECLARATION OF KENNETH T. HAAN, ESQ.; DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA STELZER, ESQ.

4/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL; DECLARATION OF KENNETH T. HAAN, ESQ.; DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA STELZER, ESQ.

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATED EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/19/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATED EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Case Management Statement -

7/13/2018: Case Management Statement -

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • Hearing10/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Hearing10/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Proceed with Default Judgment as to Cross-Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Hearing10/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Proceed with Default Judgment as to Cross-Defendants) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER ON OSC RE TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANT SUNSHINE CLEANERS, INC., AND ON FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Il Han Lee (Cross-Complainant); In Ok Lee (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC069940    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: J

HEARING DATE: Thursday, November 14, 2019

NOTICE: OK

RE: ROIC California, LLC v. Le, et al. (KC069940)

______________________________________________________________________________

 

Counsel for Cross-Defendant Sunshine Cleaners, Inc.’s (i.e., J.P. Pak of The Law Offices

of J.P. Pak) MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Responding Party: None (unopposed, as of 11/4/19, 8:50 a.m.; due 10/31/19)

 

Tentative Ruling

Counsel for Cross-Defendant Sunshine Cleaners, Inc.’s (i.e., J.P. Pak of The Law Offices

of J.P. Pak) Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED, effective upon the filing of the

proof of service showing service of the signed order upon the Client. The court sets an

Order to Show Cause Re: Representation of Corporation for ______________________.

Background

Plaintiff ROIC California, LLC (“Plaintiff”) alleges that on or about February 10, 2000, Il Han

Lee (erroneously sued as Il Han Le) and In Ok Lee (erroneously sued as In Ok Le) (collectively,

the “Lees”) executed a written Shopping Center Lease (“Lease”), wherein the Lees leased the

premises located at 529 South Glendora Avenue, Suite 529B in Glendora, California

(“premises”) from Plaintiff’s predecessor-in-interest for a 5-year term. The Lees executed

various amendments to the Lease, which, inter alia, extended the Lease to January 31, 2019.

Plaintiff alleges that The Lees assigned the Lease to Richard Chang and Helen Chang

(collectively, “the Changs”) on or about August 1, 2015, but that the Lees agreed and understood

that they would remain liable under the terms of the Lease. Plaintiff alleges that the Lease has

been breached for failure to pay rent.

On January 8, 2018, Plaintiff filed a complaint, asserting causes of action against Defendants the

Lees, the Changs and Does 1-20 for:

  1. Breach of Lease

On April 16, 2018, the Changs’ defaults were entered. On April 30, 2018, the Lees filed a cross-complaint, asserting causes of action therein against the Changs dba Mama’s Cleaners and also dba Sun Valley Cleaners, Sunshine Cleaners, Inc. dba Glendora East One Hour Cleaners and Roes 1-20 for:

  1. Breach of Written Contract

  2. Intentional Misrepresentation (Fraud and Deceit)

  3. Fraudulent Concealment (Fraud and Deceit)

  4. Negligent Misrepresentation

  5. Fraud and Fraudulent Transfer in Violation of UFTA (Civil Code §§ 3439-3439.12) and Penal Code §§ 154, 155 and 531)

The Final Status Conference is set for January 21, 2020. Trial is set for January 28, 2020.

Discussion

J.P. Pak (“Pak”) of The Law Offices of J.P. Pak seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for

Cross-Defendant Sunshine Cleaners, Inc. (“Client”).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915; People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398.

California Rule of Court (“CRC”) Rule 3.1362 requires (1) a notice of motion and motion directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under CCP § 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under CCP § 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) a proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)). The court may delay the effective date of the order relieving counsel until proof of service of a copy of the signed order on the client has been filed with the court.

Pak states that he has served the Client by mail at the Client’s last known address with copies of the motion papers served with his declaration and that he has confirmed by telephone within the past 30 days that the address is current.

Pak states in his declaration that Client and Pak are “at considerable odds regarding the means and methods of the prosecution of this action, which has caused an irreparable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship.” Pak further states that “Client has refused to communicate and cooperate with [Pak] and has not returned numerous messages.”

The court determines that the requirements of Rules of Court Rule 3.1362 enumerated above

have been sufficiently met. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED, effective upon the filing of

the proof of service showing service of the signed order upon the Client.

The court sets an Order to Show Cause Re: Representation of Corporation for

____________________.