This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2020 at 01:11:27 (UTC).

ROGET CHAHAYED VS JOHN J. NOONAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 ROGET CHAHAYED filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOHN J NOONAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAHAYED ROGET

Defendants

KRISZTINA PASKULY AS TRUSTEE OF THE NOONAN PASKULY FAMILY TRUST

PASKULY KRISZTINA

JOHN J. NOONAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE NOONAN PASKULY FAMILY TRUST

NOONAN JOHN J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN G. RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/27/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roget Chahayed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roget Chahayed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roget Chahayed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roget Chahayed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less