This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 19:16:43 (UTC).

ROGER ROBLES VS SOUTH BAY CENTER SPE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 ROGER ROBLES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTH BAY CENTER SPE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9669

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBLES ROGER

Defendants

FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES LLC

QIC US MANAGEMENT INC.

SOUTH BAY ASSOCIATES SPE LLC

SOUTH BAY CENTER SPE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAMSKY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

GOBEL SEVAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/11/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/1/2021: PI General Order

Answer

9/22/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2024
  • Hearing08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Hearing02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Hearing01/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by South Bay Center Spe, LLC (Defendant); Federal Building Services, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Federal Building Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roger Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QIC US MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH BAY CENTER SPE LLC (ERRONEOUSLY is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAMSKY MICHAEL