This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 00:00:18 (UTC).

ROGER MANLIN VS JEAN ELIZABETH JOHNSTON

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 ROGER MANLIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JEAN ELIZABETH JOHNSTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2898

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANLIN ROGER

Defendants

JOHNSTON JEAN ELIZABETH

STOLAR BERNADINE JOHNSTON

JOHNSTON LOUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MANLIN ROGER A. S. ESQ.

MANLIN ROGER ALLEN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

STOLAR BERNADINE J. ESQ.

STOLAR BERNADINE JOHNSTON ESQ.

BAKER PHILLIP A.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/10/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LOUIS JOHNSTON

2/8/2018: DECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LOUIS JOHNSTON

DECLARATION OF JMS1ES SAAKE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LOUIS JOHNSTON

2/8/2018: DECLARATION OF JMS1ES SAAKE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LOUIS JOHNSTON

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; ETC.

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; ETC.

DECLARATION OF LOUIS JOHNSTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LOUIS JOHNSTON

2/8/2018: DECLARATION OF LOUIS JOHNSTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LOUIS JOHNSTON

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT JEAN ELIZABETH JOHNSTON TO PROVIDE CODE COMPLIANT RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); ETC

2/8/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT JEAN ELIZABETH JOHNSTON TO PROVIDE CODE COMPLIANT RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); ETC

DECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND SUMMONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/13/2018: DECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND SUMMONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLATNT

2/13/2018: ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLATNT

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR, PROPOSED ORDER.

2/13/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR, PROPOSED ORDER.

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ROGER MANLIN TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR, ETC

2/21/2018: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ROGER MANLIN TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR, ETC

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO STOLAR'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST

2/27/2018: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO STOLAR'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST

NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT, BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT, BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/6/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BERNADINE JOHNSTON STOLAR'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by JEAN ELIZABETH JOHNSTON (Defendant); Louis Johnston (Defendant); Bernadine Johnston Stolar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Stay the Action Pending the Resolution of the Marital Dissolution) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (and motion to stay to plaintiff's first amended complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketOrder (re defendants motion to stay action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other Stay th...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
275 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT JOHNSTON'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF BERNADINE J. STOLAR IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT JOHNSTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT JOHNSTON'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF ORAL RENTAL AGREEMENT ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROGER MANLIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2898    Hearing Date: January 24, 2020    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

roger manlin,

Plaintiff,

vs.

jean elizabeth johnston, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 672898

Hearing Date:

January 24, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF THE MARITAL DISSOLUTION ACTION

The Court originally continued the instant motion to stay so that a settlement enforcement hearing in the marital dissolution action between Plaintiff Roger Manlin and his wife, Geraldine Manlin, currently pending in Department 81, could first be resolved. Based on the status report filed by Defendants on January 17, 2020, it appears that the hearing in the family law matter took place on January 6, 2020, but further briefing was ordered, with final papers to be filed on February 4, 2020. Therefore, the Court further continues the hearing on the instant motion to stay to __________, 2020, at 8:30 a.m., in Department 50.

Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.

DATED: January 24, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court



Case Number: ****2898    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

roger manlin,

Plaintiff,

vs.

jean elizabeth johnston, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 672898

Hearing Date:

December 5, 2019

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

ORDER RE:

DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF THE MARITAL DISSOLUTION ACTION

The Court originally continued the instant motion to stay so that a settlement enforcement hearing in the marital dissolution action between Plaintiff Roger Manlin and his wife, Geraldine Manlin, currently pending in Department 81, could first be resolved. That hearing has been continued to January 6, 2020. Therefore, the Court further continues the hearing on the instant motion to stay to 1/24/20, at 8:30 a.m., in Department 50.

Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.

DATED: December 5, 2019 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANLIN ROGER A.S.