This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 05:48:39 (UTC).

ROGELIO GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS A. G. LAYNE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 ROGELIO GONZALEZ filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against A G LAYNE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, TERRY GREEN, SAMANTHA JESSNER and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1475

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

TERRY GREEN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ ROGELIO

GONZALEZ JUANITA

Defendants

A. G. LAYNE INC.

DOW SILICONES CORPORATION

BRENNTAG PACIFIC INC.

COUNTY CHEMICAL

SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES INC.

EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY INC.

UNIVAR INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Not Classified By Court

PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUST SCOTT P

METZGER RAPHAEL

BRUST SCOTT PHILIP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FIRSTENBERG KAREN M.

KATZ DEIDRE COHEN

D'ANDREA MICHAEL

FIRSTENBERG KAREN MICHELLE

FOLEY PATRICK JAMES

DHALIWAL AMRIT K.

O'BRIEN COLLEEN M

AN LISA Y.

FURCOLO REGAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FARMER JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING SECOND AMENDED

5/18/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING SECOND AMENDED

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER, ESQ. AND DR. ROBERT HARRISON

5/13/2022: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER, ESQ. AND DR. ROBERT HARRISON

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOW SILICONES CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/13/2022: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOW SILICONES CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JENNIFER AGUILAR CSR#12993

5/16/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JENNIFER AGUILAR CSR#12993

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (A.G. LAYNE); HEARIN...) OF 05/16/2022

5/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (A.G. LAYNE); HEARIN...) OF 05/16/2022

Objection - OBJECTION TO UNTIMELY SECOND DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GARCIA FILED WITH REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES INC

5/16/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO UNTIMELY SECOND DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GARCIA FILED WITH REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES INC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (A.G. LAYNE); HEARIN...)

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (A.G. LAYNE); HEARIN...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED NOTICE OF RULINGS MADE BY THE COURT ON MAY 16, 2022

5/16/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED NOTICE OF RULINGS MADE BY THE COURT ON MAY 16, 2022

Notice of Ruling

5/16/2022: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITIONS

5/12/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITIONS

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S

5/13/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERN

5/13/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERN

Exhibit List

5/13/2022: Exhibit List

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GARCIA IN SUPPORT OF SMARKCHEM'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SMARKCHEM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ATERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GARCIA IN SUPPORT OF SMARKCHEM'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SMARKCHEM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ATERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/13/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SMARKCHEM INDUSTRIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPP TO BRENNTAG MSJ

5/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPP TO BRENNTAG MSJ

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER ISO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFS MSJ

5/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER ISO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFS MSJ

208 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • Hearing10/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Brenntag Pacific, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Second Amended); Filed by Rogelio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Juanita Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCourt's Order for Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative Summary Adjudication hearing held on 5/16/22.; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment ((A.G. Layne)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment ((Univar Solutions USA)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
254 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;) of 12/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Raphael Metzger (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rogelio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Juanita Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rogelio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rogelio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiffs' Initial Statement of Damages; Filed by Rogelio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rogelio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.G. LAYNE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Eastman Chemical Company is a litigant