This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 16:36:53 (UTC).

ROGELIO GARCIA-MENDOZA VS OSCAR L FLOREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 ROGELIO GARCIA-MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR L FLOREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5147

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GARCIA-MENDOZA ROGELIO

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 30

FLOREZ OSCAR L.

BEE TRUCKING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ ANTHONY R. JR. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

ELLIS KATHERINE A.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/6/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/15/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/15/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

10/25/2017: Unknown

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.

10/25/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.

Motion in Limine

5/31/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/30/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/30/2019: Motion in Limine

Declaration

5/30/2019: Declaration

Motion in Limine

5/30/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/30/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

5/30/2019: Motion in Limine

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

2/14/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

9/21/2018: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE PERTAINING TO PROPERTY DAMAGE ESTIMATES, REPAIR BILLS OR TOTAL LOSS APPRAISALS FOR PLAINTIFF'S OR DEFENDANTS' VEHICLES); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine ( MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PUBLICATION OF EXHIBITS WITHOUT ADVANCE NOTICE TO OPPOSING COUNSEL); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF?S USE OF THE REPTILE THEORY); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT COUNSEL FROM MAKING THE ?GOLDEN RULE? OR SIMILAR ?PLACE YOURSELF IN PLAINTIFF?S SHOES? ARGUMENTS); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TOD M. CASTRONOVO PURSUANT TO RULE 3.57 RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER TO PRECLUDE CALLING OF WITNESSES WITHOUT 24-HOUR ADVANCE NOTICE TO OPPOSING COUNSEL); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF'S NON-RETAINED EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING OR REFERENCING OPINIONS IN THE NATURE OF A RETAINED EXPERT); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Oscar L. Florez (Defendant); Bee Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rogelio Garcia-Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rogelio Garcia-Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rogelio Garcia-Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rogelio Garcia-Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5147    Hearing Date: March 19, 2020    Dept: 29

Garcia Mendoza v. Florez et al

Hearing on Defendants’ Motion for Order Reopening Discovery is CONTINUED to 5/6/2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, the court finds good cause to continue the hearing.

The Court is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEE TRUCKING INC. is a litigant