This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 17:40:46 (UTC).

ROEDER, ETHEL - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 ROEDER, ETHEL - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7595

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GRIFKA BONNIE ANN

ROEDER GLENN

Decedent

ROEDER ETHEL

Not Classified By Court

MAGADY TERRY MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PARISER ABAHAM I

DEPEW BRENDA

 

Court Documents

Notice - And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil

6/1/2021: Notice - And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil

Notice - And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil

6/1/2021: Notice - And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil

Notice - And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil

6/14/2021: Notice - And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil

Notice - Related Cases - 20STPB10801

4/23/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 20STPB10801

Minute Order

4/27/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/30/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Ruling

5/19/2021: Notice - Ruling

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/26/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Notice

5/28/2021: Notice

Contest of Will - Will Contest and Objections to Petition for Probate

4/19/2021: Contest of Will - Will Contest and Objections to Petition for Probate

Summons - ISSUED

4/19/2021: Summons - ISSUED

Will in Safekeeping - 8 pgs - Dated - 08/11/2020 - 20STSK01825

9/18/2020: Will in Safekeeping - 8 pgs - Dated - 08/11/2020 - 20STSK01825

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

2/16/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

2/16/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

2/22/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Declaration - Declaration of Bonnie Grifka ISO Petition for Probate

2/23/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Bonnie Grifka ISO Petition for Probate

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Contest of Will Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (And Acknowledgment Of Receipt - Civil ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Ruling; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSupplement; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketWill in Safekeeping (8 pgs - Dated - 08/11/2020 - 20STSK01825 ); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial) (WILL DATED 02/22/1982 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Statement of Birth Date & Driver's License ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARISER ABAHAM I

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEPEW BRENDA